VA HB414 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Safe deposit boxes. Requires the bank or other entity renting a safe deposit box to permit limited access to the box by the spouse or next of kin of the deceased lessee of the box, a court clerk, or other interested person, to look for a will or other testamentary instrument. Currently, the lessor of the safe deposit box has the option of allowing entry for such purpose.
Title
Safe deposit boxes; bank to permit limited access upon death of lessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103628D |