VA HB403 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority. Provides that the population criterion required for decisions of the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority shall be the estimates, not the projections, made by the Weldon Cooper Center for Public Service of the University of Virginia.
Title
Northern Va. Transportation Authority; use of population estimates in connection with decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102475D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB403 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB403+hil |