VA HB403 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; criteria. Adds the requirement that at least 30 percent of the jobs created must be filled by Virginia residents to the criteria for making grants or loans from the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund.
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; criteria.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | House: Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103568D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB403 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB403+hil |