VA HB4 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public accessibility of case management system. Requires the case management system operated and maintained by the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia to be open to the public for inspection. The bill provides that the case management system shall be searchable by party name, charge (for criminal cases), filing type (for civil cases), hearing date, and case number across all localities and that the entire compilation of records contained in the system shall be made available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Case management system; public accessibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100879D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171502(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback