VA HB399 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-14 - House: Stricken from House calendar
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-14 - House: Stricken from House calendar
Summary
Dialysis patient care technician. Adds the administration of erythropoeitic agents such as Epoetin alfa, Vitamin D, iron, to the list of direct care activities a dialysis patient care technician may undertake.
Title
Dialysis patient care technician; adds administration of erythropoeitic agents to list.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-14 | House: Stricken from House calendar | |
2008-01-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-10 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087871528 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB399 |