VA HB397 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB978-Anderson) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB978-Anderson) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; statewide uniform grading policy. Requires the Board of Education to establish a policy to interpret end-of-course grades in a uniform manner across the Commonwealth in grades 6 - 12, but allows for a weighted grading system for advanced placement, honors, and International Baccalaureate classes.
Title
Statewide uniform grading policy; requires Board of Education to establish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | House: Incorporated by Education (HB978-Anderson) by voice vote | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB978-Anderson) by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #2 Students and Daycare | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100416D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB397 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB397+hil |