VA HB38 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tanning facilities; use by persons under age 18. Prohibits a tanning facility from allowing individuals under age 18 to use a tanning device at such facility other than a spray tanning device that does not emit ultraviolet light. The bill includes an exception allowing a person licensed by the Board of Medicine to practice medicine or osteopathic medicine to prescribe or use a phototherapy device, as defined in the bill, for any patient regardless of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tanning facilities; prohibits use by persons under age 18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0387)
2020-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 387 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB38ER)
2020-03-04HouseEnrolled
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB38H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107543D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107543D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-22HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2020-01-21HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-20HouseRead first time
2020-01-16HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (15-Y 7-N)
2019-11-19HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2019-11-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100358D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591310.3(n/a)See Bill Text
591310.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB38&201+sum+HB38
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB38+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB38H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB38ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0387+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0003+HB0038
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1201V0041+HB0038
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0241+HB0038
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0583+HB0038
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0217+HB0038
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0038+HB0038
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1170HB0038+HB0038

Bill Comments

feedback