VA HB376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teachers, other instructional personnel, and support staff; shortages; data; reporting. Requires (i) each school board to report to the Department of Education annually the number and type of teacher, other instructional personnel, and support staff vacancies in the school division and (ii) each approved education preparation program to report to the Department of Education annually the number of individuals who completed the program by endorsement area. The bill requires the Department of Education to (a) establish deadlines for and the format of the reporting of such data and (b) aggregate and report such data annually on the Department's website.
Title
Teacher and support staff shortages; data, reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 674 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB376ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100304D-E |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB376E |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100304D |