VA HB376 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Secure and Resilient Commonwealth Panel; membership. Changes the appointing authorities for the members of the Secure and Resilient Commonwealth Panel who are selected from the Subcommittees on Public Safety of both houses from the subcommittees themselves to the Speaker of the House for the House subcommittee and the Senate Committee on Rules for the Senate subcommittee. The bill increases the membership of the Panel by adding one delegate appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates and one senator appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. In addition, the Secretary of Technology who serves as an ex officio member is replaced by the Secretary of Administration. The option of appointing committee staff to the Panel is removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure and Resilient Commonwealth Panel; changes appointing authorities for members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 822 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB376ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-29HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
2018-03-09SenateSigned by President
2018-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB376ER)
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-19HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2018-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102314D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22222.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB376
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB376+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB376ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB376ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0822+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H20V0004+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0071+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S10V0154+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB0376+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0885HB0376+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1638+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0376+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0376+HB0376
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0376+HB0376

Bill Comments

feedback