VA HB375 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibit certain local government practices that would require contractors to provide certain compensation or benefits. Prohibits local governing bodies from establishing provisions related to procurement of goods, professional services, or construction that would require a wage floor or any other employee benefit or compensation above what is otherwise required by state or federal law to be provided by a contractor to one or more of the contractor's employees as part of a contract with the locality. The prohibition shall not affect contracts between a locality and another party that were executed prior to January 1, 2019, or the renewal or future rebids of services thereof. The bill provides that localities shall not be prohibited from entering into contracts for economic development incentives in which the company receiving the incentives is required to maintain a certain stated wage level for its employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; prohibiting certain practices requiring contractors to provide compensation, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2018-04-09 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB375ER)
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18102176D-E
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 49-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended (50-Y 49-N) HB375E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (12-Y 9-N)
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2018-02-05HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-02-05House
2018-01-25HouseFailed to report (defeated) in General Laws (11-Y 11-N)
2018-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102176D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB375
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB375+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB375E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB375ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0019+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0039+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0028+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1103V0026+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0110+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0567+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0738+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0195+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB0375+HB0375
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0815HB0375+HB0375

Bill Comments

feedback