VA HB372 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - House: Tabled in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - House: Tabled in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pawnbrokers; records required to be maintained; digital images. Requires pawnbrokers to take a digital image of (i) the person involved in the transaction, (ii) the form of identification used by the person involved in the transaction, and (iii) the article or thing pawned or pledged or received on account of money loaned.
Title
Pawnbrokers; digital images required to be maintained.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | House: Tabled in General Laws by voice vote | |
2012-01-26 | House: Reconsidered by General Laws | |
2012-01-19 | House: Incorporated by General Laws | |
2012-01-19 | House: Incorporated by General Laws | |
2012-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB459-BaCote) by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101073D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB372 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB372+hil |