VA HB370 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Unpaid Department of Motor Vehicle fees; minimum amount due prior to suspension of services or privileges. Prohibits the Department of Motor Vehicles from suspending or revoking access to any services provided by the Department or the driving privileges of any person who is eligible for such suspension or revocation due to prior unpaid fees imposed by the Department if the total amount due to the Department is less than $250.
Title
DMV; fees unpaid, minimum amount due prior to suspension of services or privileges.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103521D |