VA HB368 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Housing and Community Development; stakeholder advisory group; report. Directs the Board of Housing and Community Development (the Board) to convene a stakeholder advisory group including fire code officials to evaluate and recommend revisions to the Uniform Statewide Building Code to permit Group R-2 occupancies to be served by a single exit, provided that the building has not more than six stories above grade plane. The bill requires the stakeholder advisory group to submit its findings and recommendations to the Board and to the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology no later than December 1, 2024.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; Board of HCD to convene advisory group to evaluate.
Sponsors
Del. Adele McClure [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] |
Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] | Del. Holly Seibold [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB368ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (11-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104623D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB368E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104623D |
Same As/Similar To
SB195 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Subjects
Building Code
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation