VA HB364 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Civics Education reestablished. Reestablishes the Commission on Civics Education, which expired on June 30, 2013. The purposes of the Commission are to educate students on the importance of citizen involvement in a constitutional republic, promote the study of state and local government among the Commonwealth's citizenry, and enhance communication and collaboration among organizations in the Commonwealth that conduct civics education. The Commission shall have a total of 15 members.
Title
Civics Education, Commission on; established in legislative branch of state government, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 91-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 91-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective - see bill ) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB364ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105630D-H2 |
2014-03-06 | House | Delegates: Anderson, Orrock, Howell, A.T. |
2014-03-06 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Petersen, Marsden, Vogel |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 91-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate substitute with amendments rejected by House 14104935D-S1 (2-Y 91-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB364S1 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Petersen agreed to |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Edwards agreed to |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104935D-S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104935D-S1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 9-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB364H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104388D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104388D-H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Reconsidered by Rules |
2014-01-31 | House | Tabled in Rules by voice vote |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100108D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Education
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports