VA HB352 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency management plans; victims' rights. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services and the Virginia Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund to be the lead coordinating agencies for individuals determined to be victims during critical events and emergencies under emergency management plans developed by school boards, institutions of higher education, the Board of Health, the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board, the Department of Emergency Management, and political subdivisions.
Title
Emergency management plans; victims' rights.
Sponsors
Del. John Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB352ER) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB352H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104361D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Incorporates HB380 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104361D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103526D |
Same As/Similar To
HB380 (Similar To) 2012-02-10 - House: Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 279.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 111.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 111.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |