VA HB350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Threats and harassment of certain officials and property; venue. Removes provisions that allow certain crimes relating to threats and harassment to be prosecuted in the City of Richmond if venue cannot otherwise be established and (i) the victim is the Governor, Governor-elect, Lieutenant Governor, Lieutenant Governor-elect, Attorney General, or Attorney General-elect, a member or employee of the General Assembly, a justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia, or a judge of the Court of Appeals of Virginia and (ii) such official or employee was threatened or harassed while engaged in the performance of his public duties or because of his position with the Commonwealth. The bill also removes provisions that allow threats to damage property to be prosecuted in the City of Richmond if (a) venue cannot otherwise be established and (b) the threatened property is owned by the Commonwealth and located in the Capitol District. Threats and harassment of certain officials and property; venue. Removes provisions that allow certain crimes relating to threats and harassment to be prosecuted in the City of Richmond if venue cannot otherwise be established and (i) the victim is the Governor, Governor-elect, Lieutenant Governor, Lieutenant Governor-elect, Attorney General, or Attorney General-elect, a member or employee of the General Assembly, a justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia, or a judge of the Court of Appeals of Virginia and (ii) such official or employee was threatened or harassed while engaged in the performance of his public duties or because of his position with the Commonwealth. The bill also removes provisions that allow threats to damage property to be prosecuted in the City of Richmond if (a) venue cannot otherwise be established and (b) the threatened property is owned by the Commonwealth and located in the Capitol District.
Title
Threats and harassment of certain officials and property; venue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0336) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 336 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB350ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102118D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 152.7:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 83 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |