VA HB350 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Distribution of handbills, etc., and sale of merchandise or services on highways. Makes the power to regulate and prohibit distribution of handbills, etc., and solicitation of contributions, and sale of merchandise on highways or public roadways and medians a statewide authority. The bill also adds the sale of services or attempted sale of services as a prohibited activity. This bill incorporates
Title
Distribution of handbills, etc.; adds median & public roadway to places locality can regulate, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 94 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 378 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB350ER) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (92-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105690D-S1 (92-Y 7-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105690D-S1 (98-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB350S1 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105690D-S1 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105690D-S1 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB350H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105183D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105183D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101780D |
Same As/Similar To
HB534 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) by voice vote
HB1139 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) by voice vote
HB1284 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) by voice vote
SB35 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
HB1139 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) by voice vote
HB1284 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB350-Rust) by voice vote
SB35 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)