VA HB35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Places of confinement for juveniles. Provides that when juveniles who are determined by the court to be a threat to the security or safety of other juveniles detained in a juvenile secure facility are transferred to or confined to a jail or other facility for the detention of adults, such adult-detention facility must be approved by the State Board of Corrections for the detention of juveniles. The bill removes an existing provision that such juveniles need not be separated and removed from the adult detainees when confined with adults. This bill is identical to SB 52.
Title
Juveniles; places of confinement.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2018 | |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2018 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB35ER) |
2018-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-11-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101079D |