VA HB333 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School calendar. Makes local school boards responsible for setting the school calendar and determining the opening date of the school year and eliminates the post-Labor Day opening requirement and "good cause" scenarios for which the Board of Education may grant waivers of this requirement. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
School calendar; local school boards responsbile for setting and determining opening day.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] |
Del. James LeMunyon [R] | Del. Barbara Comstock [R] | Del. Gregory Habeeb [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 77 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (75-Y 24-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by until Monday, February 10, 2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (14-Y 8-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102610D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |