VA HB331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of incapacitated person; particular Definition of incapacitated person; particular diagnosis. Specifies that a particular diagnosis shall not alone be sufficient evidence that an individual is an incapacitated person within the meaning of the definition of incapacitated person.
Title
Incapacitated person; definition, particular diagnosis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100657D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB331E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100657D |