VA HB331 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance for state and local government employees. Requires the health insurance plan for state and local government employees include a reference-based pricing component whereby a fixed maximum amount is paid for certain frequently performed nonemergency medical tests, procedures, and surgeries for which prices vary substantially and the quality of outcomes generally do not correlate with price.
Title
Health insurance; plan for state and local government employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101456D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB331 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB331+hil |