VA HB330 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Transplant Council. Authorizes the Virginia Transplant Council to hire its own employees and pay them with moneys from the Virginia Donor Registry and Public Awareness Fund. The bill eliminates language designating the Board of Health as the budgetary administrator for the operation and administration of the Council and provides that the Council, rather than the Board of Health on its behalf as in current law, will administer the Fund and may apply for, accept, and expend gifts, grants, and donations on its own behalf. The Board of Health will continue to have authority to apply for, accept, and expend gifts, grants, and donations on behalf of the Council.
Title
Transplant Council; authorized to hire its own employees, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 692 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB330ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB330H1 | |
2012-01-30 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104638D-H1 | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104638D-H1 | |
2012-01-26 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101424D |