VA HB318 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm industry members; standards of responsible conduct; civil liability. Creates standards of responsible conduct for firearm industry members and requires such members to establish and implement reasonable controls regarding the manufacture, sale, distribution, use, and marketing of the firearm industry member's firearm-related products, as those terms are defined in the bill. Such reasonable controls include reasonable procedures, safeguards, and business practices that are designed to (i) prevent the sale or distribution of a firearm-related product to a straw purchaser, a firearm trafficker, a person prohibited from possessing a firearm under state or federal law, or a person who the firearm industry member has reasonable cause to believe is at substantial risk of using a firearm-related product to harm themselves or unlawfully harm another or of unlawfully possessing or using a firearm-related product; (ii) prevent the loss of a firearm-related product or theft of a firearm-related product from a firearm industry member; (iii) ensure that the firearm industry member complies with all provisions of state and federal law and does not otherwise promote the unlawful manufacture, sale, possession, marketing, or use of a firearm-related product; and (iv) ensure that the firearm industry member does not engage in an act or practice in violation of the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. The bill also provides that a firearm industry member may not knowingly or recklessly create, maintain, or contribute to a public nuisance, as defined in the bill, through the sale, manufacturing, importing, or marketing of a firearm-related product. The bill creates a civil cause of action for the Attorney General or a local county or city attorney to enforce the provisions of the bill or for any person who has been injured as a result of a firearm industry member's violation to seek an injunction and to recover costs and damages.
Title
Firearm industry members; creates standards of responsible conduct, civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 47-N) (Y: 49 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB318ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 47-N) |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (49-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (8-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104492D |
Same As/Similar To
SB491 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |