VA HB309 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Forestry; Forestland and Urban Tree Canopy Conservation Plan required. Requires the Department of Forestry, in coordination with a Technical Advisory Committee composed of stakeholders, to develop a Forestland and Urban Tree Canopy Conservation Plan no later than November 1, 2026, and update such plan at least once every five years thereafter. The bill requires the Department to post and maintain on its website the most recent version of the Plan and to submit the Plan to the Governor and Chairmen of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources no later than November 30, 2026, and following any update to such plan.
Title
Forestland and Urban Tree Canopy Conservation Plan; Department of Forestry shall establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0278) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 278 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB309ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y -0-N) |
2024-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Marsden, Salim, French |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Hope, Glass, Marshall |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108638D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB309S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108638D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108638D-S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB309H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24105613D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 24105613D-H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103381D |
Same As/Similar To
SB461 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0354)