VA HB307 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance notices. Clarifies and updates provisions regarding notices from insurance companies to applicants and policyholders. The measure amends the requirement that insurers give insureds notice when increasing the premium on their policies due to accidents to clarify that insurers are required to inform insureds that they have 60 days to seek a review by the Bureau of Insurance of the application of a surcharge. The notice requirements regarding uninsured motorist coverage (UM/UIM) is updated to allow the practice under which insurers give applicants the opportunity to request UM/UIM limits equal to their liability limits or to request lower UM/UIM limits, as long as the lower limits are at least $25,000/$50,000/$20,000. Other changes clarify which notices are required to be given on new business policies only rather than on new and renewal business policies.
Title
Insurance companies; clarifies and updates provisions regarding notices to applicants, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 558 (effective 1/1/17) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB307ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-21 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101547D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |