VA HB304 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion; born alive infant; treatment and care; penalty. Requires every health care provider licensed by the Board of Medicine who attempts to terminate a pregnancy to (i) exercise the same degree of professional skill, care, and diligence to preserve the life and health of an infant who has been born alive following such attempt as a reasonably diligent and conscientious health care practitioner would render to any other child born alive at the same gestational age and (ii) take all reasonable steps to ensure the immediate transfer of the infant who has been born alive to a hospital for further medical care. A health care provider who fails to comply with the requirements of this act is guilty of a Class 4 felony and may be subject to disciplinary action by the Board of Medicine. The bill also requires every hospital licensed by the Department of Health to establish a protocol for the treatment and care of an infant who has been born alive following performance of an abortion and for the immediate reporting to law enforcement of any failure to provide such required treatment and care. Abortion; born alive infant; treatment and care; penalty. Requires every health care provider licensed by the Board of Medicine who attempts to terminate a pregnancy to (i) exercise the same degree of professional skill, care, and diligence to preserve the life and health of an infant who has been born alive following such attempt as a reasonably diligent and conscientious health care practitioner would render to any other child born alive at the same gestational age and (ii) take all reasonable steps to ensure the immediate transfer of the infant who has been born alive to a hospital for further medical care. A health care provider who fails to comply with the requirements of this act is guilty of a Class 4 felony and may be subject to disciplinary action by the Board of Medicine. The bill also requires every hospital licensed by the Department of Health to establish a protocol for the treatment and care of an infant who has been born alive following performance of an abortion and for the immediate reporting to law enforcement of any failure to provide such required treatment and care.
Title
Abortion; born alive human infant, failure to provide treatment and care, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB304H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106090D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106090D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103215D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 76.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |