VA HB293 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Statement of expenses incident to prosecution. Clarifies that no expense on the statement of expenses incident to prosecution prepared by the clerk of court after a criminal trial shall exceed any applicable statutory limit set for such expense.
Title
Prosecution; statement of expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102589D |