VA HB293 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Determining facility of temporary detention. Provides that an individual for whom a temporary detention order is issued shall be detained in a state facility unless the state facility or an employee or designee of the community services board is able to identify an alternative facility that is able and willing to provide temporary detention. The bill also provides that under no circumstances shall a state facility fail or refuse to admit an individual who meets the criteria for temporary detention unless an alternative facility has agreed to accept the individual. The Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services shall submit an annual report to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Appropriations and Senate Finance Committees on the implementation of the provisions of the bill.
Title
Temporary detention; determining facility for individual.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 96-N) (Y: 3 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 96-N) (Y: 3 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 773 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB293ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2014-03-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-08 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105612D-H3 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Miller, McWaters |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Delegates: Bell, R.B., Cline, Toscano |
2014-03-04 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-03 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 96-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 14105062D-S1 (3-Y 96-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB293S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105062D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105198D-S1 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB293H2 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 14104929D-H2 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee on Courts of Justice substitute rejected 14104740D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB243 |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104929D-H2 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104740D-H1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102524D |
Same As/Similar To
HB243 (Similar To) 2014-02-03 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 809.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |