VA HB291 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB291

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Uniform Collaborative Law Act. Creates the Uniform Collaborative Law Act, which provides a framework for the practice of collaborative law, a process entered into voluntarily by clients for the express purpose of reaching a settlement in a family or domestic relations law matter, including (i) marriage, divorce, dissolution, annulment, and property distribution; (ii) child custody, visitation, and parenting time; (iii) alimony, spousal support, maintenance, and child support; (iv) adoption; (v) parentage; and (vi) negotiation or enforcement of premarital, marital, and separation agreements. The Act governs disclosure of information, privilege against disclosure of communications, and scope of representation by the attorneys in the proceeding. Uniform Collaborative Law Act. Creates the Uniform Collaborative Law Act, which provides a framework for the practice of collaborative law, a process entered into voluntarily by clients for the express purpose of reaching a settlement in a family or domestic relations law matter, including (i) marriage, divorce, dissolution, annulment, and property distribution; (ii) child custody, visitation, and parenting time; (iii) alimony, spousal support, maintenance, and child support; (iv) adoption; (v) parentage; and (vi) negotiation or enforcement of premarital, marital, and separation agreements. The Act governs disclosure of information, privilege against disclosure of communications, and scope of representation by the attorneys in the proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Collaborative Law Act; created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-01-22HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101390D

Same As/Similar To

HB291 (Carry Over) 2020-01-22 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback