VA HB289 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Handicapped parking. Allows localities by ordinance to grant four hours free parking to vehicles exhibiting disabled parking indicia in some places while not granting such free parking in other places.
Title
Handicapped parking; allows localities by ordinance to grant free parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0017) | |
2012-02-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB289ER) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103088D |
Same As/Similar To
SB454 (Same As) 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)