VA HB286 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wineries; dogs allowed inside. Provides that dogs may be allowed within a designated area inside or on the premises of a licensed winery or farm winery, distillery, or brewery or farm brewery, except in any area used for the manufacture of food products. Current law provides that no animal shall be permitted in any area used for the manufacture of food products, with certain exceptions for guard or guide animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food and drink sanitary requirements; exception for dogs in wineries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB286ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-30HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB286ER)
2018-03-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-27HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N)
2018-02-27HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107081D-S1 (95-Y 3-N)
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-23SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB286S1
2018-02-23SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107081D-S1
2018-02-23SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-23SenateRead third time
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107081D-S1
2018-02-15SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
2018-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
2018-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB286H1
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105921D-H1
2018-01-29HouseRead second time
2018-01-26HouseRead first time
2018-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105921D-H1
2018-01-24HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104142D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325115(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB286
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB286+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB286H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB286S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB286ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB286ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0819+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0101V0011+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0005+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0136+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0093+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0284+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB0286+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0672HB0286+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1074+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1635+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1252HB0286+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1259HB0286+HB0286
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1260HB0286+HB0286

Bill Comments

feedback