VA HB28 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Pawnbrokers. Removes provisions enacted in 2019 that currently allow only natural persons to be licensed as pawnbrokers. The measure authorizes any person, defined in this bill as an individual or a business entity organized under the laws of the Commonwealth, that otherwise satisfies the requirements for licensure to operate as a pawnbroker. The bill repeals an enactment that authorized localities to extend the license of a pawnbroker who is not a natural person for a period of up to one year.
Title
Pawnbrokers; removes provision that currently allows only natural persons to be licensed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100530D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 4000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |