VA HB2797 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Handgun and assault firearm transfers; criminal history record checks; age requirement; penalty. Provides that to purchase a handgun or an assault firearm from a licensed firearm dealer, a person must (i) be age 21 or older, (ii) have attained age 18 by July 1, 2019, or (iii) be 18, 19, or 20 and have received a high school diploma, have passed a high school equivalency examination approved by the Board of Education, or be a member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the National Guard of the Commonwealth or any other state and must consent in writing to have the dealer obtain criminal history record information. The bill also redefines "assault firearm" as the term applies to firearm transfers by licensed firearm dealers by reducing from more than 20 to more than 10 the number of rounds of ammunition that a firearms magazine for such firearm will hold in order to be defined as an "assault firearm."
Title
Handgun and assault firearm transfers; criminal history record checks, age requirement, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104846D |