VA HB279 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Career and technical education; three-year licenses. Directs the Board of Education to provide for the issuance of three-year licenses to qualified individuals to teach high school career and technical education courses in specific subject areas for no more than 50 percent of the instructional day or year, on average.
Title
Career and technical education; three-year licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB279ER) |
2016-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-02 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105623D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB279S1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105623D-S1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105623D-S1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB279H1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104758D-H1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104758D-H1 |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101098D |
Same As/Similar To
SB573 (Same As) 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)