VA HB2764 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; persons assisting with completion or collection of completed voter registration applications; certain identifying information required. Requires any person who assists an applicant with the completion of a paper voter registration application or collects a completed paper voter registration application directly from an applicant to provide his name and telephone number and indicate the group or organization with which he is affiliated, if any, on the registration application. The bill prohibits any registration application from being denied on the basis of such information not being provided. The measure exempts from such requirement any state or local government employee who assists with the completion of registration applications or who collects completed registration applications as part of his official duties. The identifying information of the person assisting with the completion of an application or collecting a completed paper application shall not be entered into the registration record of the applicant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; persons assisting with completion or collection of completed applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2019-03-22 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2764ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19101405D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2764E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment from Appropriations agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments from Privileges and Elections agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 9-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (12-Y 10-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19101405D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242418.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2764
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2764+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2764E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2764ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1802V0014+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0012+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0204V0012+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0068+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2491+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0120+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2764+HB2764
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0750HB2764+HB2764

Bill Comments

feedback