VA HB2762 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Firefighting foam management. Prohibits, beginning July 1, 2021, the use for training purposes or for testing, with some exceptions, of a class B firefighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals, as defined in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighting foam management; use of foam that contains PFAS chemicals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 838 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2762ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-08HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2762ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2762H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105779D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105779D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104452D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.34:29(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2762
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2762+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2762H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2762ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2762ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0838+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0103V0022+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0045+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2188+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2262+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0128+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2762+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2762+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3400+HB2762
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1181HB2762+HB2762

Bill Comments

feedback