VA HB2761 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Cave and karst protection; penalty. Authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to include karsts and related landscape features, defined in the bill, in various functions related to cave protection, including education of public agencies and private landowners, collection of data, and protection of groundwater flow from pollution. The bill makes pollution of any sinking stream, swallet, or other karst feature a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cave and karst protection; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19102215D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011000(n/a)See Bill Text
1011002(n/a)See Bill Text
1011005(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback