VA HB2755 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Conservation easements; comprehensive plan. Requires that the use of real property for open-space land shall conform to the official comprehensive plan for the area in which the property is located. Current law provides that no conservation easement shall be valid and enforceable unless the limitations it creates conform in all respects to the comprehensive plan at the time the easement is granted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservation easements; comprehensive plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N 1-A) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, Lewis, McClellan
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Fariss, Poindexter, Plum
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N 1-A)
2019-02-20HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 96-N 1-A)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-19SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-19SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19104628D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2755E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19104628D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011010(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2755
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2755+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2755E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0023+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0039+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2203+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0086+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2755+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2755+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3172+HB2755
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0925HB2755+HB2755

Bill Comments

feedback