VA HB2721 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Employment of school security officers; law-enforcement officers previously employed by the United States or any state or political subdivision thereof; carrying a firearm in performance of duties. Allows a school security officer to carry a firearm in the performance of his duties if, within 10 years immediately prior to being hired by the local school board, he was employed by a law-enforcement agency of the United States or any state or political subdivision thereof and his duties were substantially similar to those of a law-enforcement officer in the Commonwealth. Under current law, only a school security officer who was an active law-enforcement officer in the Commonwealth within 10 years immediately prior to being hired by the local school board may qualify to carry a firearm in the performance of his duties. The bill also provides that the Department of Criminal Justice Services' duty to establish minimum training standards and other requirements for school security officers includes establishing minimum training standards and requirements for school security officers previously employed by a law-enforcement agency of the United States or any state or political subdivision thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School security officers; employment, law-enforcement officers previously employed by the U.S.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2721ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (79-Y 17-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106813D-S1 (79-Y 17-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2721S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106813D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106813D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (65-Y 32-N)
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education (16-Y 5-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 19100996D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221280.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2721
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2721+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2721S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2721ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0493+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0015+HB2721
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0069+HB2721
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2192+HB2721
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0263+HB2721
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2721+HB2721
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0771HB2721+HB2721
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3082+HB2721

Bill Comments 750

feedback