VA HB271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Substance Abuse Recovery Support Services Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the Substance Abuse Recovery Support Services Grant Program to provide grants to recovery support services providers in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to convene a work group of stakeholders to develop criteria for awarding grants.
Title
Substance Abuse Recovery Support Services Grant Program; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB271ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB271ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB271H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 12104487D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee amendment rejected | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104487D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (17-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100036D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Narcotics and Drugs
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Narcotics and Drugs
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports