VA HB2687 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Special license for hunting elk. Authorizes the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries (the Board) to create a special license for hunting elk. Such license shall be required in addition to general hunting licenses. The bill authorizes the Board to establish guidelines (i) related to selection of applicants for eligibility to purchase a special elk license and (ii) permitting the transfer of special elk licenses to individuals or wildlife conservation organizations whose mission is to ensure the conservation of Virginia's wildlife resources. The bill authorizes the Board to establish a nonrefundable application fee of $15 for residents and $20 for nonresidents and a special elk license fee at no more than $40 for residents and $400 for nonresidents. The bill directs the Board, as funds become available, to utilize a portion of the fees collected for special elk licenses to compensate an owner or lessee of agricultural land for agricultural damage directly caused by elk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting elk; authorizes Board of GIF to create a special license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenatePassed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with letter (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendments
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (84-Y 14-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2687H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105676D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105676D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19104020D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291305.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback