VA HB268 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land Bank Entities Act. Authorizes the establishment of a land bank entity by any locality or two or more localities combined to assist in addressing vacant, abandoned, and tax-delinquent real properties. Under the bill, the locality has the option of (i) creating an authority or a nonprofit, nonstock corporation or (ii) designating an existing nonprofit entity that is exempt from taxation under § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code and eligible to receive donations from a locality pursuant to § 15.2-953 to carry out the functions of such land entity. The bill provides that land bank entities may acquire real property within participating localities or receive transfers and conveyances from the participating localities. Land bank entities are authorized to receive funding through grants and loans from participating localities, the Commonwealth, the federal government, and other public and private sources. In addition, the bill authorizes a locality to deem paid in full all accumulated taxes, penalties, interest, and other costs on any tax-delinquent property in exchange for conveyance of the property by the owner to a land bank entity. The bill also authorizes a participating locality to remit to the land bank entity up to 50 percent of the real property taxes collected on real property conveyed by a land bank entity for up to 10 years after the conveyance. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission.
Title
Land Bank Entities Act; established.
Sponsors
Del. Daniel Marshall [R] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 82 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0383) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 383 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB268ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB268ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 19-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 16103273D-E |
2016-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB268E |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103273D |
Same As/Similar To
SB414 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 7500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 7512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3970.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |