VA HB268 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural operations; local regulation of certain activities. Protects certain activities at agricultural operations from local regulation in the absence of substantial impacts on the public welfare and requires localities to take certain factors into account when regulating any of several activities: the conduct of agritourism activities, the sale of agricultural or silvicultural products or related items, the preparation or sale of foods that otherwise comply with state law, and other customary activities. Localities are prohibited from subjecting the listed activities to a special-use permit requirement in the absence of a substantial impact on health, safety, or public welfare and in most situations are prevented from stringently regulating the sound produced by the listed activities. The bill provides that its provisions shall not affect an entity licensed in accordance with the alcoholic beverage control laws, affect the provisions of the Right to Farm Act, alter the provisions of § 15.2-2288.3 (licensed farm wineries), or restrict the taxation authority of any locality.
Title
Agricultural operations; local regulation of certain activities, On-Farm Activities Working Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 23-N) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 23-N) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 494 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB268ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 18-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (81-Y 18-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 7-N) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 23-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 23-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 14104244D-EH1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB268EH1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Amendment by Delegate Orrock agreed to |
2014-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104244D-H1 |
2014-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104244D-H1 |
2014-01-22 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (17-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2013-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101999D |
Same As/Similar To
SB51 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)