VA HB2668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; support services positions; behavior analysts. Includes licensed behavior analysts and licensed assistant behavior analysts as support services positions in a local school division for the purposes of Title 22.1 (Education) of the Code of Virginia.
Title
Support services positions; includes licensed behavior analysts, etc., in local school division.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104350D |