VA HB2653 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; innovation; Innovative Internship Fund and Program established. Permits any public institution of higher education to propose in conjunction with the six-year plan process, and the General Assembly to adopt by reference in the general appropriation act, an innovative proposal for a performance pilot that advances the objectives of the Virginia Higher Education Opportunity Act of 2011. The bill provides that the General Assembly may approve no more than six performance pilots per year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innovative Internship Fund and Program; created and established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2653ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseReconsideration of pass by for the day agreed to
2019-02-23SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-23HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107723D-H2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Norment, Howell, Newman
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Rush, Jones, S.C., Torian
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106820D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2653S1
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106820D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106820D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2653H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106169D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106169D-H1
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Special Subcommittee on Amazon
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19102320D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231306(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2653
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2653+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2653H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2653S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2653H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2653ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0794+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0209V0003+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0044+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2331+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0400+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2653+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2653+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3222+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB2653+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1125HB2653+HB2653
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3364+HB2653

Bill Comments

feedback