VA HB264 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain local government practices that would require contractors to provide certain compensation or benefits. Prohibits local governing bodies from establishing provisions related to procurement of goods, professional services, or construction that would require a wage floor or any other employee benefit or compensation above what is otherwise required by state or federal law to be provided by a contractor to one or more of the contractor's employees as part of a contract with the locality. The prohibition shall not affect contracts between a locality and another party that were executed prior to January 1, 2017, or the renewal or future rebids of services thereof. Also, localities shall not be prohibited from entering into contracts for economic development incentives in which the company receiving the incentives is required to maintain a certain stated wage level for its employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; prohibiting certain practices requiring contractors to provide compensation, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20HousePassed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-03-11 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2016-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
2016-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
2016-03-03SenateSigned by President
2016-02-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-02-29HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB264ER)
2016-02-29HouseEnrolled
2016-02-25SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2016-02-25SenateRead third time
2016-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-22SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2016-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
2016-02-15HouseRead third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N)
2016-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 16100770D-E
2016-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB264E
2016-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2016-02-12HouseRead second time
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-09HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 7-N)
2016-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
2016-01-18HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2015-12-31HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2015-12-31HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100770D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB264
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB264+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB264E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB264ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H1102V0018+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0054+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0071+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H11V0088+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0518+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S12V0089+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0597HB0264+HB0264
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0623HB0264+HB0264

Bill Comments

feedback