VA HB2634 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; local referendums. Allows the sale of mixed beverages by licensed restaurants and the sale of alcoholic beverages by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority in any county, town, or supervisor's election district unless a referendum is held and a majority of the voters voting in such referendum vote to prohibit such sales. Under current law, such sales are prohibited unless they have been approved through the referendum process. The bill includes a grandfathering provision that allows the granting of a mixed beverage license to any establishment described in ?§4.1-126, as it was in effect prior to the effective date of this bill, notwithstanding the provisions of the bill related to local referendums but subject to other applicable laws and regulations. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020, but allows localities to hold anticipatory referendums between July 1, 2019, and June 30, 2020, and provides that the results of such referendums shall become valid and enforceable on July 1, 2020. The bill provides that the result of any referendum held prior to July 1, 2019, shall remain valid and enforceable for a period of five years. This bill is identical to SB 1110.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; local referendums.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 178 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2634ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 3-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 30-N 1-A)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (67-Y 30-N 1-A)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2634H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105774D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105774D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 19104143D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41100(n/a)See Bill Text
41119(n/a)See Bill Text
41121(n/a)See Bill Text
41122(n/a)See Bill Text
41124(n/a)See Bill Text
41126(n/a)See Bill Text
41221.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2634
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2634+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2634H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2634ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0178+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0013+HB2634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0074+HB2634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2003+HB2634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0080+HB2634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB2634+HB2634
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0533HB2634+HB2634

Bill Comments

feedback