VA HB26 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Failure to carry concealed handgun permit; penalty. Provides that failure to produce, upon demand of a law-enforcement officer, a concealed handgun permit and a government-issued photo identification while carrying a concealed handgun is punishable by a $25 civil penalty. A court may waive this penalty if the person presents a valid concealed handgun permit and government-issued photo identification to the court. The bill also introduces an affirmative defense of having a valid concealed handgun permit to a charge of violating the concealed weapons statute with a handgun.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; failure to produce upon demand of a law-enforcement officer, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132) | |
2012-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 132 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB26ER) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House (82-Y 17-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100454D-E | |
2012-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB26E | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (17-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2011-12-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-12-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100454D |