VA HB2597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse and neglect report or complaint; victims of sex trafficking; taking child victim into custody. Requires a local department of social services to conduct a sex trafficking assessment upon receiving a complaint of suspected child abuse that is based upon information and allegations that a child is a victim of sex trafficking, provided that the local department has not determined that a separate investigation or family assessment is required. The bill also allows a child-protective services worker of a local department responding to such complaint to take the child victim into custody and allows the local department to maintain custody of the child for up to 72 hours without prior approval of a parent or guardian. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to SB 1661.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse and neglect; victims of sex trafficking, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2597ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106816D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2597S1
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106816D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106816D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2597H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105105D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105105D-H1
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19104111D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321506(n/a)See Bill Text
6321508(n/a)See Bill Text
6321517(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2597
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2597+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2597H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2597S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2597ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0381+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0038+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0026+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0205V0004+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0034+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2330+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0274+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0341+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2597+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2597+HB2597
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3074+HB2597

Bill Comments

feedback