VA HB2572 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Berryville. Reorganizes the charter of the Town of Berryville. Specific amendments include (i) an update to the boundary description, (ii) replacing the position of recorder with vice mayor, (iii) specifying certain town council appointments, and (iv) removing or updating obsolete provisions.
Title
Berryville, Town of; amending charter, reorganizes charter.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 308 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2572ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101409D-E |
2019-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2572E |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101409D |